OK HB3826 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Initiative and referendum; modifying initiative and referendum forms and cover sheet; modifying verification of signatures; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiative and referendum; modifying initiative and referendum forms and cover sheet; modifying verification of signatures; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 05/21/2020
2020-05-15HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-14HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-13SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
2020-05-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-05-12SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-12SenateWithdrawn from Rules committee
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2020-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19
2020-03-04HouseAmended
2020-03-04HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2020-03-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Sanders, Lepak
2020-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback