OK HB3803 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Courts; court reporters; providing a one-time stipends for court reporters; effective date; emergency.
Title
Courts; court reporters; providing a one-time stipends for court reporters; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |