OK HB3776 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions; nonprofit museum.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions; nonprofit museum.
Sponsors
Rep. John Waldron [D] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 27; Ayes: 55 Nays: 27 |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Waldron |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |