OK HB3756 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Courts; authorizing use of videoconferencing in district court proceedings; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; authorizing use of videoconferencing in district court proceedings; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 05/21/2020
2020-05-15HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2020-05-15HouseSA's read, adopted
2020-05-15HouseSA's received
2020-05-15SenateEngrossed to House
2020-05-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-05-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2020-05-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-05-14SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
2020-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author)
2020-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Miller
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback