OK HB3746 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; Insurance Code; modifying; effective date.
Title
Insurance; Insurance Code; modifying; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2020-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |