OK HB3736 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; awarding stipend for eligible student participating in the teacher internship program; effective date.
Title
Schools; awarding stipend for eligible student participating in the teacher internship program; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Waldron |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |