OK HB3717 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; voter registration card; proof of identity; photograph; effective date.
Title
Elections; voter registration card; proof of identity; photograph; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative ODonnell |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |