OK HB3717 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; payment of funeral costs for National Guard on active duty; effective date.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; payment of funeral costs for National Guard on active duty; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Thomas Marti [R] | Rep. John Talley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Marti, Hill |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Davis |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |