OK HB3693 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/30/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/30/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amusements and sports; Horse Racing Commission; appointments; prohibiting expending certain funds when other funds are available; effective date.
Title
Amusements and sports; Horse Racing Commission; appointments; prohibiting expending certain funds when other funds are available; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Culver [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/30/2024 |
2024-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 6 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2024-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2024-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2024-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2024-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2024-05-21 | House | Remove Senator Stephens as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Kidd |
2024-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Stephens, Newhouse, Pemberton, Rader, Kidd, Haste, Dossett |
2024-05-16 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil |
2024-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2024-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Coleman; authored by Senator Stephens |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 |
2024-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Culver |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |