OK HB3693 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; modifying and deleting background check investigation procedures for handgun licenses; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; modifying and deleting background check investigation procedures for handgun licenses; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-03-19Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 32
2018-03-14HouseTitle stricken
2018-03-14HouseAmended
2018-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-01HouseRemove Representative Calvey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Gann
2018-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Calvey
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21129010Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
21129011Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
21129012New CodeSee Bill Text
21129014New CodeSee Bill Text
21129018New CodeSee Bill Text
21129019New CodeSee Bill Text
2112902New CodeSee Bill Text
21129020Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
21129023New CodeSee Bill Text
2112905New CodeSee Bill Text
2112909New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback