OK HB3693 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying and deleting background check investigation procedures for handgun licenses; effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying and deleting background check investigation procedures for handgun licenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-19 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 32 |
2018-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Remove Representative Calvey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Gann |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Calvey |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1290 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 20 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |