OK HB3683 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nurse practitioners; definitions; modification; supervision; effective date.
Title
Nurse practitioners; definitions; modification; supervision; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-28 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |