OK HB3683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; removal of officers; adding causes for removal; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; removal of officers; adding causes for removal; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 30 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Burns |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |