OK HB3666 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Industrial Hemp Program; directing the Department to establish rules to regulate cross-pollination; registry; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Industrial Hemp Program; directing the Department to establish rules to regulate cross-pollination; registry; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 16 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Thompson |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |