OK HB3663 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Vetoed 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Vetoed 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; motor license agents; removal; free speech; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; motor license agents; removal; free speech; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Vetoed 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-05-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Hill |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs |
2020-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |