OK HB3654 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; issuance of identification card upon discharge; effective date.
Title
Veterans; issuance of identification card upon discharge; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sims |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |