OK HB3647 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Golf Trail Creation Act; emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Golf Trail Creation Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Dills [R] | Sen. James Leewright [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Rep. Anthony Moore [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-11 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3 |
2022-05-11 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 |
2022-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Boles |
2022-03-09 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Dills |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |