OK HB3644 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; requiring special agents of federal agencies to contact county sheriffs under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; requiring special agents of federal agencies to contact county sheriffs under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: State Powers Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: State Powers Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19 |
2024-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute State Powers Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to State Powers |
2024-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Remove Representative Boatman as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steagall |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |