OK HB3641 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; small farm winery or winemaker license; samples; distiller license; satellite locations; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; small farm winery or winemaker license; samples; distiller license; satellite locations; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 16 |
2022-03-23 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Strom |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Dempsey |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |