OK HB3638 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; alcohol excise tax; spirits; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; alcohol excise tax; spirits; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddy Dempsey [R] | Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 12 |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Kidd |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Dempsey |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |