OK HB3637 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; agriculture sales tax exemption; forestry; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; agriculture sales tax exemption; forestry; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Dempsey |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |