OK HB3619 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cities and towns; prohibiting certain codes and ordinances; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cities and towns; prohibiting certain codes and ordinances; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 05/19/2020
2020-05-13HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-13HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-13SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
2020-05-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-05-12SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-12SenateWithdrawn from General Government committee
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2020-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16
2020-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2020-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Martinez
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2020-02-19HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative ODonnell
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback