OK HB3616 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; penalties for bypassing security checkpoints; authorizing certain persons to bypass certain checkpoints; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; penalties for bypassing security checkpoints; authorizing certain persons to bypass certain checkpoints; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-05SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-05SenateWithdrawn from Public Safety committee
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Lowe
2020-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2020-03-09HouseAmended
2020-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2020-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative ODonnell
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback