OK HB3610 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; modifying definition of permanent disability in the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act; effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; modifying definition of permanent disability in the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative ODonnell |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |