OK HB3590 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; expenses of extraordinary legislative sessions; payments; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; expenses of extraordinary legislative sessions; payments; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 9; Ayes: 68 Nays: 11
2018-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
623467Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback