OK HB3589 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - CR; Do Pass General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - CR; Do Pass General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Water; Water Resources Board Fee Revolving Fund; requiring claims paid from the revolving fund be approved solely by the Board; effective date; emergency.
Title
Water; Water Resources Board Fee Revolving Fund; requiring claims paid from the revolving fund be approved solely by the Board; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |