OK HB3586 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Downing, McDugle, West (Kevin), Kannady, West (Rick), Gann, Baker, Russ, Teague, Hall, Mulready, Murdock, Rogers, Osburn (Mike), Calvey, Cleveland, Taylor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Downing, McDugle, West (Kevin), Kannady, West (Rick), Gann, Baker, Russ, Teague, Hall, Mulready, Murdock, Rogers, Osburn (Mike), Calvey, Cleveland, Taylor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; creating the Forming Open and Robust University Minds Act; effective date.
Title
Higher education; creating the Forming Open and Robust University Minds Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Kevin Calvey [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] |
Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] |
Rep. Michael Rogers [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Rep. Tess Teague [R] | Rep. Rick West [R] |
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Downing, McDugle, West (Kevin), Kannady, West (Rick), Gann, Baker, Russ, Teague, Hall, Mulready, Murdock, Rogers, Osburn (Mike), Calvey, Cleveland, Taylor |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |