OK HB3567 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; issuance of obligations; emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; issuance of obligations; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 9 |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Thompson, Taylor, Pugh, Dugger, Hall, Boren |
2022-05-19 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Amended |
2022-03-14 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-14 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |