OK HB3564 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; creating the Oklahoma Future Teacher Scholarship and Employment Incentive Program; effective date; emergency.
Title
Teachers; creating the Oklahoma Future Teacher Scholarship and Employment Incentive Program; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 4 |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-17 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-17 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Provenzano |
2022-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Pemberton, Pugh, Dahm, Merrick, Stanley, Taylor, Hicks |
2022-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Waldron |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 5 |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker, Phillips, Nollan |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |