OK HB3561 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; athlete concussions; creating a school athlete concussion registry within the State Department of Health; reports of school athlete concussions and deaths; effective date.
Title
Schools; athlete concussions; creating a school athlete concussion registry within the State Department of Health; reports of school athlete concussions and deaths; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Baker |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn, Lawson |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |