OK HB3552 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education; creating the Oklahoma Education Act; effective date.
Title
Education; creating the Oklahoma Education Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |