OK HB3546 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health; directing the Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to promulgate rules for certification of Problem Gambling Treatment Counselors; renewal; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health; directing the Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to promulgate rules for certification of Problem Gambling Treatment Counselors; renewal; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2020-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Randleman
2020-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2020-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2020-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck
2020-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Public Health
2020-02-19HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Townley
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback