OK HB3543 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Higher education; establishing the Oklahoma Free Speech Committee to the Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; establishing the Oklahoma Free Speech Committee to the Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-20HouseApproved by Governor 04/20/2022
2022-04-19HouseSent to Governor
2022-04-19SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2022-04-19HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2022-04-18HouseReferred for enrollment
2022-04-18SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2022-04-18SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2022-04-18SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2022-04-05SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2022-03-24SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2022-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2022-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2022-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 27; Ayes: 61 Nays: 22
2022-03-09HouseEmergency added
2022-03-09HouseAmended by floor substitute
2022-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2022-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2022-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
2022-02-22HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Tech
2022-02-22HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2022-02-08HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2022-02-07HouseAuthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
2022-02-07HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3543&Session=2200
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB3543%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3543%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB3543%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB3543%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB3543%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB3543%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB3543%20FULLPCS1%20CHAD%20CALDWELL-MJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB3543%20FA1%20CALDWELLCH-MJ.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3543%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3543%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3543%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB3543_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3543_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback