OK HB3539 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Early education; Oklahoma Early Education Savings Plan Act; income tax deduction; effective date.
Title
Early education; Oklahoma Early Education Savings Plan Act; income tax deduction; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |