OK HB3537 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; permitting chiropractic physicians to possess, prescribe or administer certain articles of natural origin; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; permitting chiropractic physicians to possess, prescribe or administer certain articles of natural origin; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |