OK HB3524 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Department of Human Services guardianship programs; providing information; effective date.
Title
Children; Department of Human Services guardianship programs; providing information; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Brewer |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17 |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Young (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Goodwin |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |