OK HB3515 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Police officers; requiring the use of body-worn recording equipment under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Police officers; requiring the use of body-worn recording equipment under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Goodwin |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |