OK HB3512 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator Garvin
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator Garvin
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; retail pharmacy network access standards; pharmacy benefit managers; health insurers; effective date.
Title
Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; retail pharmacy network access standards; pharmacy benefit managers; health insurers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-23 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Kendrix, Roberts (Eric), Phillips, Roe, Fugate |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Fetgatter, Johns, Moore, Frix, Dollens, Sims, West (Tammy), Hasenbeck, Townley, Dobrinski, Kerbs, May, Lawson, Hilbert |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |