OK HB3508 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; prohibited acts on highways; requiring certain liability insurance for tractors carrying cargo; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibited acts on highways; requiring certain liability insurance for tractors carrying cargo; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-15 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2020-05-14 | House | SA's received |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-05-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Quinn |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Quinn; authored by Senator Standridge |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |