OK HB3498 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credit; qualified software engineers and employers; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credit; qualified software engineers and employers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |