OK HB3482 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; re-creating the Board; modifying termination date; modifying powers and duties of the Board; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; re-creating the Board; modifying termination date; modifying powers and duties of the Board; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Agriculture and Wildlife committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |