OK HB3473 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-29)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Definitions and general provisions; designating the official inspirational

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions and general provisions; designating the official inspirational

Sponsors

Rep. John Jordan [R]Sen. Mike Schulz [R]Rep. Kevin Calvey [R]Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]
Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. George Faught [R]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. Scott Inman [D]
Rep. Scott Martin [R]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]Rep. Jason Murphey [R]Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]
Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]
Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]
Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]
Rep. Donnie Condit [D]Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]
Rep. Travis Dunlap [R]Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Chad Caldwell [R]Rep. Jon Echols [R]
Rep. Katie Henke [R]Rep. David Perryman [D]Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R]
Rep. Charles McCall [R]Rep. Greg Babinec [R]Rep. Cyndi Munson [D]Rep. Regina Goodwin [D]
Rep. George Young [D]Rep. Kevin Wallace [R]Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D]Rep. Chuck Strohm [R]
Rep. Shane Stone [D]Rep. Michael Rogers [R]Rep. Ryan Martinez [R]Rep. Jason Lowe [D]
Rep. Mark Lawson [R]Rep. Dell Kerbs [R]Rep. Justin Humphrey [R]Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R]
Rep. Tom Gann [R]Rep. Avery Frix [R]Rep. Roger Ford [R]Rep. Jacob Rosecrants [D]
Rep. Karen Gaddis [D]Rep. Zack Taylor [R]Rep. Rande Worthen [R]Rep. Tammy West [R]
Rep. Kevin West [R]Rep. Josh West [R]Rep. Rick West [R]Rep. Collin Walke [D]
Rep. Ross Ford [R]Rep. Tess Teague [R]Rep. Mike Osburn [R]Rep. Monroe Nichols [D]
Rep. Carl Newton [R]Rep. Matt Meredith [D]Rep. Marcus McEntire [R]Rep. Scott McEachin [R]
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R]Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R]Rep. Tim Downing [R]Rep. Mickey Dollens [D]
Rep. Dale Derby [R]Rep. Carol Bush [R]Rep. Meloyde Blancett [D]Rep. Forrest Bennett [D]
Rep. Rhonda Baker [R]Rep. John Pfeiffer [R]Rep. Scooter Park [R]Rep. John Montgomery [R]
Rep. Ben Loring [D]Rep. Mark Lepak [R]Rep. Chris Kannady [R]Rep. Claudia Griffith [D]
Rep. Jason Dunnington [D]Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R]Rep. Elise Hall [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]
Rep. Glen Mulready [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]
Rep. Harold Wright [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Rep. Dan Kirby [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]
Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Todd Russ [R]Sen. Mark Allen [R]Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R]Sen. Wayne Shaw [R]

Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseApproved by Governor 04/19/2018
2018-04-18HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-18HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-18HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-18HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2018-04-18HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Shaw
2018-04-18HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-16HouseSA's received
2018-04-16SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2018-04-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen
2018-04-09SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-04-09SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2018-03-28SenateAuthored by Senator Schulz
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 0
2018-03-15HouseAmended
2018-03-15HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-15HouseCoauthored by all other Representatives
2018-03-15HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Administrative Rules
2018-02-19HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Jordan
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
259414Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3473&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB3473%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB3473%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB3473%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB3473%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB3473%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB3473%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB3473%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3473_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB3473_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback