OK HB3473 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-29)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-29)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Definitions and general provisions; designating the official inspirational
Title
Definitions and general provisions; designating the official inspirational
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-18 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Shaw |
2018-04-18 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-15 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Administrative Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |