OK HB3468 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; creating the Cannabis Commission; duties; directing State Department of Health to provide support staff and office space; Board membership.
Title
Medical marijuana; creating the Cannabis Commission; duties; directing State Department of Health to provide support staff and office space; Board membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 29; Ayes: 51 Nays: 29 |
2018-03-15 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Emergency added |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |