OK HB3454 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; authorizing school district boards to adopt policies regarding sex trafficking and exploitation prevention and awareness education programs; programs for institutions of higher education; effective date.
Title
Schools; authorizing school district boards to adopt policies regarding sex trafficking and exploitation prevention and awareness education programs; programs for institutions of higher education; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 25 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |