OK HB3440 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; Commissioners of the Land Office; Teacher Bonus Revolving Fund; State Aid formula; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; Commissioners of the Land Office; Teacher Bonus Revolving Fund; State Aid formula; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] |
Rep. Dale Derby [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Tess Teague [R] | Rep. Rick West [R] |
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Scott McEachin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2018-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Silk |
2018-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick), Bennett (John), West (Kevin), Roberts (Sean), Derby, Humphrey, Coody, Strohm, Murphey, Russ, Ritze, Teague |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Common Education Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |