OK HB3438 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed in Committee - Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed in Committee - Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; replacing Transportation Commission districts with circuit engineering districts as recipient of certain funds; effective date.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; replacing Transportation Commission districts with circuit engineering districts as recipient of certain funds; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Transportation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 27 |
2018-03-15 | House | Emergency removed |
2018-03-15 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dunlap, Babinec, Martinez, Tadlock, Fetgatter, Roberts (Sean), Taylor, Teague, Cleveland, Murphey |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), ODonnell, West (Kevin) |
2018-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |