OK HB3429 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; authorizing the electronic transmission of certain information; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; authorizing the electronic transmission of certain information; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Strom |
2022-02-14 | House | General Order |
2022-02-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |