OK HB3407 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Act; modifying definition of excavate; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Act; modifying definition of excavate; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25
2018-05-02SenateCCR adopted
2018-05-01SenateCCR read
2018-05-01HouseTo Senate
2018-05-01HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 11
2018-05-01HouseCCR adopted
2018-04-23HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
2018-04-23HouseCCR submitted
2018-04-19SenateConference granted, SCs named Allen, Fields, David, Pederson, Rader, Matthews, Floyd
2018-04-18HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Utilities
2018-04-12HouseSA's received
2018-04-12SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2018-04-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-04-05SenateReported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2018-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 24
2018-03-13HouseAmended
2018-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Utilities
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Watson
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631422New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3407&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB3407%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3407%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB3407%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB3407%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB3407%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB3407%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB3407%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3407_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB3407_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback