OK HB3401 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain social media exchanges; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain social media exchanges; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2020-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13
2020-03-10HouseAuthored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
2020-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback